skip to content

Ottawa Fertility Centre

The information about outcomes/statuses associated with an OHP relate only to the OHP procedures captured in regulation and performed at the OHP. For more information about outcomes/status and what they mean, go to the Public Register.

Summary

Current Business Address:
955 Green Valley Crescent
Unit 100
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3V4

DateOutcome/StatusDetails
Apr 16, 2019 Pass View PDF
Nov 24, 2015 Pass View PDF
Apr 24, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 23, 2015 Pass with Conditions View PDF
Mar 01, 2012 Pass View PDF